Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Burgess, Linda, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against O'Bryan, Benard J., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions56 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time85 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Linda Burgess
Date: December 31, 2015Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: December 31, 2015Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Benard J. O'Bryan Filed
Date: February 25, 2016Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: January 05, 2016Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's UD Judgment (CCP 1169) As To Benard J. O'Bryan Filed
Date: February 25, 2016Default Judgment: Clerk's UD (CCP 1169) Entered
Date: February 25, 2016Writ of Possession - Satisfied Filed
Date: March 25, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.