Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Vega, Leticia, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Vega, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Brad Seligman presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Time To Trial57 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions60 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time60 days |
Memo to Set - Counter Filed for Defendant
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Joseph Vega
Date: 2016-01-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Leticia Vega
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Civil Court Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: February 29, 2016Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Master Court Trial Called and Completed
Date: February 26, 2016Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 02/10/2016 09:00 AM D- 702
Date: 2016-01-14T00:00:00Objection to Counter-Request to Set Case for Jury Trial Filed
Date: February 23, 2016Unlawful Detainer Court Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-02-17T00:00:00Declaration of Attorney Alec E. Dams Notifying The Court and Opposing Counsel of Counsel's Unavailab
Date: 2016-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Of Non-Waiver of California Rules of Court Filed
Date: 2016-02-17T00:00:00Judgment Entered
Date: February 29, 2016Unlawful Detainer Court Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2016-02-10T00:00:00Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-01-14T00:00:00Civil Court Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: February 26, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.