Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gus Williams, Williams, Gus, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against California Department Of Motor Vehicles, Jean Shiomoto, Shiomoto, Jean, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Sandra K. Bean presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management137 days |
|
Filing DateApril 16, 2015 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions267 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time1510 days |
Dismissal Court Ordered : Delay in Prosecution (CCP 583) Filed
Date: June 04, 2019Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: February 11, 2019Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: November 30, 2017Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: November 30, 2017Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: November 30, 2017Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 11/30/2017 02:30 PM D- 19
Date: September 07, 2017Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: June 29, 2017Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: June 29, 2017Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: June 29, 2017Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: February 02, 2017Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: February 02, 2017Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: February 02, 2017Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 02/02/2017 02:30 PM D- 301
Date: January 12, 2017Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: June 28, 2016Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: June 28, 2016Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: June 28, 2016Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: March 29, 2016Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: March 29, 2016Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: March 29, 2016Proof of Service by Mail of Updated Case Management Statement Filed
Date: March 24, 2016Case Management Statement of Gus Williams Filed
Date: March 24, 2016Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: January 25, 2016Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: January 25, 2016Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: January 25, 2016Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: January 08, 2016Case Management Statement of Gus Williams Filed
Date: January 08, 2016Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 01/25/2016 02:30 PM D- 521
Date: December 23, 2015Proof of Service on Complaint As to California Department of Motor Vehicles Filed
Date: January 08, 2016Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: December 18, 2015Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: December 01, 2015Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: December 01, 2015Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: December 01, 2015Proof of Service on Complaint As to Gus Williams Filed
Date: November 19, 2015Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: November 12, 2015Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: November 12, 2015Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: November 12, 2015Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: October 05, 2015Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: October 05, 2015Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: October 05, 2015Case Management Statement of Gus Williams Filed
Date: September 18, 2015Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 18, 2015Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: August 31, 2015Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: August 31, 2015Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: August 31, 2015Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: April 17, 2015Initial Case Management Conference 08/31/2015 02:30 PM D- 516
Date: April 17, 2015Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: April 16, 2015Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: April 16, 2015Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Gus Williams
Date: April 16, 2015Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: April 16, 2015Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected
Date: January 19, 2016Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-12-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Gus Williams
Date: 2015-04-16T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2015-09-18T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-08-31T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 01/25/2016 02:30 PM D- 521
Date: 2015-12-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Gus Williams Filed
Date: 2015-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 08/31/2015 02:30 PM D- 516
Date: 2015-04-17T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Gus Williams Filed
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2015-04-17T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2015-04-16T00:00:00Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: 2015-04-16T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-10-05T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-08-31T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-12-01T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-10-05T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-11-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: November 30, 2017Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 11/30/2017 02:30 PM D- 19
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Dismissal Court Ordered : Delay in Prosecution (CCP 583) Filed
Date: June 04, 2019Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: November 30, 2017Case Management Statement of Gus Williams Filed
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected
Date: 2016-01-19T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to California Department of Motor Vehicles Filed
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To California Department of Motor Vehicl
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail of Updated Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2016-03-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Gus Williams Filed
Date: 2016-03-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 02/02/2017 02:30 PM D- 301
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: February 11, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.