Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Rodriguez, Fatima K., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2015 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions62 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time419 days |
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: February 20, 2015Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: April 14, 2016Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected
Date: May 20, 2015Proof of Service on Complaint As to Fatima K. Rodriguez Filed
Date: March 09, 2015Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for LVNV Funding LLC
Date: February 20, 2015Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 05/09/2016 09:00 AM D- 14
Date: April 07, 2016Compliance Hearing 04/25/2016 01:30 PM D- 108
Date: February 16, 2016Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: 2015-02-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.