Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Pohahau, Livona, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Ronni B. MacLaren presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management138 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryCollections |
Time To Trial138 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time201 days |
Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Livona Pohahau Filed
Date: 2015-01-15T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Livona Pohahau
Date: 2015-02-03T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: May 18, 2015Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2015-02-05T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: May 18, 2015Initial Case Management Conference 05/18/2015 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: 2015-02-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Filed
Date: March 13, 2015Case Management Statement of Livona Pohahau Filed
Date: April 28, 2015Declaration of Plaintiff in Lieu of Personal Testimony at Trial Filed
Date: June 25, 2015Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: July 20, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.