Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Bittkofer VS Hayward Unified School District
On December 31, 2014 a civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Wynne S. Carvill presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 31, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Stephen Pulido;Category
Other Employment
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
General Employment
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
2 years, 1 month and 8 days
Time To Trial
1 year, 3 months and 20 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered |
|
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed |
|
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing Vacated: Civil Jury Trial 01/30/2017 08:30 AM D- 16 | |
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing Vacated: Civil Jury Trial 01/20/2017 01:31 PM D- 16 | |
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 04/04/2017 03:00 PM D- 16 |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385) |
|
January 06, 2017 |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Wynne Carvill |
||
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed |
|
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Sign-in-Sheet Filed |
|
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Compliance Hearing 02/09/2017 03:00 PM D- 16 | |
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference |
|
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 01/06/2017 09:00 AM D- 1C |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference Statement of Gurbakhash Bittkofer Filed |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference Statement of Hayward Unified School District Filed |
|
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Proposed Jury Questionnaire and Voir Dire Questions Lodged |
|
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Plaintiff's Witness List Filed |
|
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Index of Exhibits Filed |
|
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion in Limine No.5 Filed |
|
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Glossary of Unusal Terms Filed |
|
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion in Limine No.3 Filed |
|
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Proposed Jury Instruction Filed |
|
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion in Limine No.2 Filed |
|
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous excerpts of deposition and other discovery responses and declaration of Aleshia M. Whi |
|
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Proposed Neutral Statement of the Case Lodged |
|
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Proposed Jury Verdict Form Lodged |
|
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion in Limine No. 1 Filed |
|
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed |
|
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Trial Brief Filed |
|
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion in Limine No.4 Filed |
|
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Filed |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Evidence Filed |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support & Including, Exhibits to Trial Documents Filed |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Trial Brief Filed |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion in Limine No. 6 to Exclude Evidence Filed |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Statement of the Case Filed |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence Filed |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exxlude Evidence of any Alleged Descrimination Filed |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion in Limine No. 11 to Exclude any Reference to Hearsay Filed |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion in Limine No. 12 to Exclude Evidence of any "Statistics" Filed |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion in Limine No. 5 to Exclude any Testimony Filed |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Exhibits Filed |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Evidence of any Alledged Harassment Filed |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | List of Witness Filed |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion in Limine No. 10 to Exclude Pltf from Testifying as to the Manner Filed |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Lodging Original Deposition Transcripts Filed |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion in Limine No. 8 to Exclude Pltf from Testifying Filed |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion in Limine No. 9 to Exclude all Evidence Involving the Actions Filed |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Evidence Filed |
|
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed |
|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address Filed |
|
April 21, 2016 |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Stephen Pulido |
||
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 01/06/2017 09:00 AM D- 16 | |
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order Issued |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Jury Trial 01/20/2017 01:31 PM D- 16 | |
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Jury Trial 01/30/2017 08:30 AM D- 16 | |
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement of Gurbakhash Bittkofer Filed |
|
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement of Hayward Unified School District Filed |
|
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 04/21/2016 03:00 PM D- 16 |
|
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order Filed |
|
February 18, 2016 |
Motion to Strike Complaint
Judge: Stephen Pulido |
||
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion to Strike Complaint Denied |
|
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed |
|
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Answer to Amended Complaint Filed for Hayward Unified School District |
|
February 08, 2016 |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Stephen Pulido |
||
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed |
|
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conf Continuance 04/21/2016 03:00 PM D- 509 | |
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Reply to Opposition to Motion to Strike Filed |
|
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order Issued |
|
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement of Hayward Unified School District Filed |
|
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion to Strike Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 02/18/2016 03:00 PM D- 509 | |
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion to Strike Complaint Filed for Defendant |
|
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Fourth Amended Complaint Filed |
|
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement of Gurbakhash Bittkofer Filed |
|
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed |
|
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order Filed |
|
December 01, 2015 |
Motion to Strike
Judge: Stephen Pulido |
||
December 01, 2015 |
Demurrer
Judge: Stephen Pulido |
||
December 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion to Strike - Dropped |
|
December 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed |
|
December 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Demurrer Sustained With Leave to Amend |
|
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Reply to Opposition to Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint Filed |
|
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Reply to Opposition to Motion to Strike Filed |
|
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Opposition to Motion to Strike Portions of Third Amended Complaint Filed |
|
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed |
|
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Opposition to Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint Filed |
|
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice Filed for Plaintiff |
|
November 02, 2015 |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Stephen Pulido |
||
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed |
|
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Conf Continuance 02/08/2016 03:00 PM D- 509 | |
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order Issued |
|
October 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement of Gurbakhash Bittkofer Filed |
|
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement of Hayward Unified School District Filed |
|
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Demurrer Filed by Hayward Unified School District |
|
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion to Strike Filed by Hayward Unified School District |
|
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Demurrer Hearing Confirmed for 12/01/2015 03:00 PM D- 509 | |
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion to Strike Hearing Confirmed for 12/01/2015 03:00 PM D- 509 | |
September 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Third Amended Complaint Filed |
|
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Dismissal As to Defendant: Donna Becnel, Christine Quinn Entered |
|
September 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order Filed |
|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Donna Becnel, Christine Quinn Filed |
|
September 03, 2015 |
Motion to Amend Complaint
Judge: Stephen Pulido |
||
September 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion to Amend Complaint Granted |
|
September 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed |
|
August 31, 2015 |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Stephen Pulido |
||
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order Issued |
|
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed |
|
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Conf Continuance 11/02/2015 03:00 PM D- 509 | |
August 13, 2015 |
Motion to Amend Complaint
Judge: Stephen Pulido |
||
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued |
|
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 509 date: 09/03/2015 time: 03:00 PM | |
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion to Amend Complaint - Motion Rescheduled |
|
August 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Objection Filed |
|
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support of Costs Incurred in Preparation of Demurrer and Motion to Strike 2nd Amended |
|
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion to Amend Complaint - Motion Rescheduled |
|
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 509 date: 08/13/2015 time: 03:00 PM | |
August 04, 2015 |
Motion to Strike
Judge: Stephen Pulido |
||
August 04, 2015 |
Demurrer
Judge: Stephen Pulido |
||
August 04, 2015 |
Motion to Amend Complaint
Judge: Stephen Pulido |
||
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed |
|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Demurrer - Dropped |
|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion to Amend Complaint Taken Under Submission |
|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion to Strike - Dropped |
|
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement of Gurbakhash Bittkofer Filed |
|
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Reply To Def Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Amend Second Amended Complaint Filed |
|
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint Filed |
|
July 16, 2015 |
Motion to Strike
Judge: Stephen Pulido |
||
July 16, 2015 |
Demurrer
Judge: Stephen Pulido |
||
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Demurrer - Motion Rescheduled |
|
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued |
|
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion to Strike - Motion Rescheduled |
|
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 509 date: 08/04/2015 time: 03:00 PM | |
July 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Reply to Opposition to Motion to Strike Filed |
|
July 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Reply to Opposition to Demurrer Filed |
|
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion to Amend Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 08/04/2015 03:00 PM D- 509 | |
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion to Amend Complaint Filed by Gurbakhash Bittkofer |
|
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice Filed for Plaintiff |
|
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Filed |
|
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support of Opposition to Demurrer Filed |
|
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Opposition to Motion to Strike Filed |
|
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Opposition Filed |
|
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice Filed for Defendant |
|
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion to Strike Hearing Confirmed for 07/16/2015 03:00 PM D- 509 | |
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Filed by Hayward Unified School Di |
|
June 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Demurrer Second Amended Complaint Filed by Hayward Unified School District |
|
June 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Demurrer Hearing Confirmed for 07/16/2015 03:00 PM D- 509 | |
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Notice of Entry of Order re Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint Sustained Filed |
|
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Second Amended Complaint Filed |
|
May 18, 2015 |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Stephen Pulido |
||
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Case Management Conf Continuance dept: 509 date: 08/31/2015 time: 03:00 PM | |
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued |
|
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Deposited Advanced Jury Fees Filed |
|
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement of Gurbakhash Bittkofer Filed |
|
April 30, 2015 |
Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint
Judge: Stephen Pulido |
||
April 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed |
|
April 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Demurrer Sustained With Leave to Amend |
|
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement of Hayward Unified School District, Donna Becnel, Christine Quinn Filed |
|
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Reply to Opposition to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint Filed |
|
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Opposition to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint Filed |
|
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Filed |
|
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice Filed for Gurbakhash Bittkofer |
|
April 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 04/30/2015 03:00 PM D- 509 | |
April 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint Filed by Christine Quinn, Donna Becnel, Hayward Unified Scho |
|
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed |
|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Rejection Letter Issued on Summons Issued and Filed |
|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed |
|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event | First Amended Complaint Filed |
|
January 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued |
|
January 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Initial Case Management Conference 05/18/2015 03:00 PM D- 509 |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Complaint - Other Employment Filed (Amended) |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Gurbakhash Bittkofer |
|