Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Collopy, Alma, Collopy, Michael, Collopy, Sean, Gonzalez, Felipe Armenta, Ocegueda Sanchez, Maria Carmen, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Collopy, Alma, Collopy, Michael, Collopy, Paul, Collopy, Sean, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Gail Brewster Bereola presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management161 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
Time To Trial226 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions166 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time502 days |
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed for Michael Collopy, Alma Collopy, Sean Collopy
Date: 2015-02-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Sean Collopy, Alma Collopy, Michael Collopy, Paul Collopy Filed
Date: 2015-05-28T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Paul Collopy Filed
Date: 2015-01-20T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Paul Collopy Filed
Date: 2015-06-15T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-06-10T00:00:00Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed
Date: 2015-05-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Felipe Armenta Gonzalez, Maria Carmen Ocegueda Sanchez Filed
Date: 2015-08-12T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 06/10/2015 09:00 AM D- 19
Date: 2015-01-02T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Answer to Complaint
Date: 2015-02-18T00:00:00Notice of of Jury Fee Deposit Filed
Date: 2015-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: December 29, 2015Order DEPT.19 TRAL SETTING ORDER AND NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL Filed
Date: April 14, 2016Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed
Date: 2015-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2015-01-02T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-06-10T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Michael Collopy Filed
Date: 2015-01-20T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Sean Collopy, Alma Collopy, Michael Collopy
Date: 2015-02-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Felipe Armenta Gonzalez Filed
Date: 2015-05-27T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: May 16, 2016Notice of Mediator Selection Filed
Date: January 19, 2016Case Management Statement of Felipe Armenta Gonzalez Filed
Date: 2015-07-30T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Sean Collopy Filed
Date: 2015-01-20T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Felipe Armenta Gonzalez
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Mediation Date Filed
Date: January 26, 2016Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Felipe Armenta Gonzalez
Date: 2015-05-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Sean Collopy, Alma Collopy, Michael Collopy, Paul Collopy Filed
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Notice of Mediator Report Filed
Date: February 16, 2016Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alma Collopy Filed
Date: 2015-01-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.