Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Prasad, James J, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Winn, Jessica Joy, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 15, 2014 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions15 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time43 days |
Writ of Possession - Satisfied Filed
Date: January 27, 2015Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: December 15, 2014Default Judgment: Clerk's UD (CCP 1169) Entered
Date: December 30, 2014Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: December 17, 2014Proof of Service on Complaint As to Jessica Joy Winn Filed
Date: December 30, 2014Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's UD Judgment (CCP 1169) As To Jessica Joy Winn Filed
Date: December 30, 2014Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: 2014-12-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for James J Prasad
Date: 2014-12-15T00:00:00Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Filed and Entered
Date: December 30, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.