Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Standard Lakeside 1, Lp, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Standard Lakeside 1, Lp, Ashtari, Daryoush, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Julia Spain presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 28, 2014 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions21 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time181 days |
Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Daryoush Ashtari Filed
Date: 2014-09-18T00:00:00Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 10/08/2014 01:30 PM D- 705
Date: 2014-09-19T00:00:00Returned Mail: Notice of Appeal Filed
Date: November 19, 2014Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Standard Lakeside 1, LP
Date: 2014-08-28T00:00:00Notice of Appeal Filed by Daryoush Ashtari
Date: November 06, 2014Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Filed and Entered
Date: 2014-09-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous Notice to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed
Date: November 06, 2014Unlawful Detainer Court Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: October 08, 2014Answer to Complaint Filed for Daryoush Ashtari
Date: 2014-09-09T00:00:00Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2014-09-18T00:00:00Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: 2014-08-28T00:00:00Writ of Possession - Satisfied Filed
Date: November 03, 2014Judgment Entered
Date: 2014-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Default on Appeal Filed
Date: November 06, 2014Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2014-08-28T00:00:00Order of Dismissal Issued
Date: January 12, 2015Remittitur Filed
Date: February 25, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.