Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Friedkin Realty Group Inc VS Montanez
On August 25, 2014 a civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Kimberly E. Colwell presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 25, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Category
Unlawful Detainer
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
3 years, 2 months and 1 day
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered | |
October 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed |
|
October 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered | |
October 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed |
|
September 18, 2017 |
Compliance Hearing
Judge: Kimberly E. Colwell |
||
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Complaint Unlawful Detainer Dismissed |
|
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed |
|
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Compliance Hearing 09/18/2017 09:15 AM D- 511 |
|
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Order to Vacate Judgment Filed |
|
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted |
|
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: |
|
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession - Unsatisfied Filed |
|
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Complaint As to Victor Guerrero Filed |
|
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Default Judgment: Clerk's UD (CCP 1169) Entered |
|
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Default Judgment: Clerk's UD (CCP 1169) | |
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Complaint As to Sonia Guerrero Filed |
|
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Issued | |
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Judgment Default : Clerk CCP 1169/Money Pending Granted | |
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Complaint As to Maria Montanez Filed |
|
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's UD Judgment (CCP 1169) As To Maria Montanez, Rene Guerrero, |
|
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Complaint As to Rene Guerrero Filed |
|
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued |
|
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed |
|
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed |
|
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Friedkin Realty Group Inc |
|