Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Crawford, Shanale, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 08, 2014 |
CategoryCollections |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time388 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Synchrony Bank
Date: August 08, 2014Compliance Hearing 09/17/2015 09:01 AM D- 14
Date: August 03, 2015Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: August 31, 2015Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: August 17, 2015Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: August 08, 2014Notice of of Intent to proceed with Judgment Filed
Date: October 10, 2014Proof of Service on Complaint As to Shanale Crawford Filed
Date: August 25, 2014Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: August 08, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.