Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Unifund Ccr, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Pan, Ivan J, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management138 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2014 |
CategoryCollections |
Time To Trial138 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time278 days |
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2014-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Ivan J Pan Filed
Date: 2014-03-18T00:00:00Declaration of Diligence Filed
Date: 2014-02-28T00:00:00Declaration of Diligence Filed
Date: 2014-03-04T00:00:00Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: 2014-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Ivan J Pan Filed
Date: 2014-03-13T00:00:00General Denial To Complaint Filed for Ivan J Pan
Date: 2014-03-13T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: June 16, 2014Case Management Statement of Unifund CCR, LLC Filed
Date: June 16, 2014Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Unifund CCR, LLC
Date: 2014-01-29T00:00:00Declaration Statement of Venue Filed
Date: 2014-01-29T00:00:00Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)
Date: October 20, 2014Initial Case Management Conference 06/16/2014 02:30 PM D- 522
Date: 2014-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2014-02-03T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: November 03, 2014Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-06-16T00:00:00Civil Court Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: October 20, 2014Case Management Statement of Ivan J Pan Filed
Date: 2014-06-03T00:00:00Compliance Hearing 02/17/2015 03:30 PM D- 522
Date: October 20, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.