Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rodriguez , Juan Miguel, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Radilla-Romero , Raul, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Michael E. Ballachey presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management135 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2013 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time260 days |
Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2014-02-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Juan Miguel Rodriguez Filed
Date: 2014-01-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Juan Miguel Rodriguez Filed
Date: 2014-02-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: 2013-12-02T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2014-01-23T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-01-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Raul Radilla-Romero Filed
Date: 2013-12-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Juan Miguel Rodriguez
Date: 2013-09-10T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2013-09-10T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Raul Radilla-Romero Filed
Date: 2013-10-10T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: April 20, 2014Notice of Settlement Filed for Juan Miguel Rodriguez
Date: April 07, 2014Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: 2013-09-10T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: May 28, 2014Case Management Statement of Raul Radilla-Romero Filed
Date: 2014-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2013-09-10T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 01/23/2014 09:15 AM D- 15
Date: 2013-09-10T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Posting Jury fees Filed
Date: 2013-09-23T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: April 02, 2014Answer to Complaint Filed for Raul Radilla-Romero
Date: 2013-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of jury fees by Raul Radilla-Romero Filed
Date: 2013-12-23T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of Raul Radilla-Romero Filed
Date: April 01, 2014Association of Attorneys Filed
Date: 2014-02-07T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of Juan Miguel Rodriguez Filed
Date: April 01, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.