Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Watkins Real Estate, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Bohn, Tim, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Michael E. Ballachey presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 18, 2013 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions19 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time230 days |
Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tim Bohn Filed
Date: 2013-08-06T00:00:00Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Filed and Entered
Date: 2013-08-06T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default as to all un-named tenants/occupants Filed and Entered
Date: 2013-08-06T00:00:00Application Re: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession) Conditionally Granted
Date: 2013-08-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous (Attachments & Proofs by the DEF Bohn) Filed
Date: 2013-09-03T00:00:00Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: 2013-07-18T00:00:00Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's UD Judgment (CCP 1169) As To Tim Bohn Filed
Date: 2013-08-06T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2013-08-30T00:00:00Proof of Service on all un-named tenants/occupants Filed
Date: 2013-08-06T00:00:00Default Judgment: Clerk's UD (CCP 1169) Entered
Date: 2013-08-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Watkins Real Estate
Date: 2013-07-18T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2013-07-18T00:00:00Application Re: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession) Filed for Tim Bohn
Date: 2013-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: 2013-07-19T00:00:00Declaration of Diligence Filed
Date: 2013-08-06T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2013-08-26T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2013-09-03T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-09-03T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte 09/03/2013 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: 2013-08-30T00:00:00Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected
Date: January 14, 2014Release of Funds Issued and Filed
Date: September 09, 2013Application Re: Other Ex Parte Denied
Date: 2013-09-03T00:00:00Judgment Entered
Date: March 05, 2014Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed
Date: February 20, 2014Writ of Possession - Satisfied Filed
Date: October 22, 2013Proposed Order Filed
Date: December 27, 2013Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed
Date: December 27, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.