Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gb Holdings Ii, Lp, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Porras, Raymond Manuel, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 18, 2013 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions21 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time251 days |
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: June 18, 2013Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for GB Holdings II, LP
Date: 2013-06-18T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Raymond Manuel Porras Filed
Date: July 09, 2013Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: June 19, 2013Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: 2013-06-18T00:00:00Default Judgment: Clerk's UD (CCP 1169) Entered
Date: July 09, 2013Returned Mail: Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Filed
Date: February 24, 2014Writ of Possession - Satisfied Filed
Date: July 29, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.