Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lezotte, John, Amrhein, Paul, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case against Future Foam, Inc., American Polyfoam Company, Inc., Alexakos, Steve, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Michael E. Ballachey presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management136 days |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 2013 |
CategoryWrongful Termination |
Time To Trial263 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Case Cycle Time378 days |
Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2013-08-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Paul Amrhein, John Lezotte Filed
Date: 2013-08-12T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 08/26/2013 03:30 PM D- 18
Date: 2013-04-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Steve Alexakos, American Polyfoam Company, Inc., Future Foam, Inc. File
Date: 2013-08-12T00:00:00Complaint - Wrongful Termination Filed
Date: 2013-04-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2013-08-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Paul Amrhein
Date: 2013-04-12T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Steve Alexakos, American Polyfoam Company, Inc., Future Foam, Inc.
Date: 2013-06-28T00:00:00Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)
Date: April 25, 2014Civil Court Trial 07/21/2014 09:30 AM D- 18
Date: December 31, 2013Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2013-04-15T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2013-05-28T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 08/26/2013 09:00 AM D- 18
Date: 2013-08-05T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2013-04-12T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: April 25, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.