Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hamaguchi, Chiharu, Hamaguchi , Yoichi, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Cabanlit , Jacqueline, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2013 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions21 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time54 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Yoichi Hamaguchi
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default as to all un-named tenants/occupants Filed and Entered
Date: January 23, 2013Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Jacqueline Cabanlit Filed
Date: 2013-01-10T00:00:00Proof of Service on all un-named tenants/occupants Filed
Date: January 23, 2013Proof of Service on Complaint As to Jacqueline Cabanlit Filed
Date: 2013-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: 2013-01-04T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Returned Mail: Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Filed
Date: January 18, 2013Returned Mail: Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Filed
Date: January 16, 2013Request Re: Default UD Judgment (CCP 1169) Filed
Date: January 24, 2013Default Judgment: Clerk's UD (CCP 1169) Entered
Date: January 24, 2013Writ of Possession - Satisfied Filed
Date: February 26, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.