Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Main Street Acquisition Corp, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Heffington, Jr, Chris, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2013 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions292 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time424 days |
Proof of Service on Complaint As to Chris Heffington, Jr Filed
Date: January 25, 2013Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: January 03, 2013Compliance Hearing 03/05/2014 09:01 AM D- 31
Date: December 30, 2013Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: January 03, 2013Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To Chris Heffington, Jr Filed
Date: October 22, 2013Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Main Street Acquisition Corp
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected
Date: November 05, 2013Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: March 03, 2014Opposition to OSC (Declaration) Filed by Main Street Acquisition Corp
Date: February 21, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.