Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kmf Camden, Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Ali, Danyal, Geyer, Kaitlyn, Geyer, Pamela, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Jeffrey Brand presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2012 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time2627 days |
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: January 17, 2012Complaint Unlawful Detainer Dismissed
Date: March 28, 2019Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: January 17, 2012Returned Mail: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal Filed
Date: January 08, 2019Civil OSC 03/28/2019 01:30 PM D- 511
Date: December 27, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for KMF Camden, LLC
Date: January 17, 2012Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: January 19, 2012Civil OSC Commenced and Completed
Date: March 28, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.