Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Volunteers Of America, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Gomer , Angelica, Gomez , Angel, Gomez , Ivan, Gomez , Sinthia, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2012 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time2627 days |
Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: January 17, 2012Civil OSC Commenced and Completed
Date: March 28, 2019Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: January 17, 2012Complaint Unlawful Detainer Dismissed
Date: March 28, 2019Civil OSC 03/28/2019 01:30 PM D- 511
Date: December 27, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Volunteers of America
Date: January 17, 2012Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: January 17, 2012Returned Mail: OSC Re: Dismissal Filed
Date: January 08, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.