Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Paclik, Charles Thomas, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against United Parcel Service Inc, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Gail Brewster Bereola presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management195 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2012 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
|
Case Cycle Time688 days |
Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 06/28/2013 09:00 AM D- 19
Date: December 18, 2012Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2012-01-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Charles Thomas Paclik Filed
Date: June 28, 2013Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: November 14, 2012Notice of Removal Filed for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Date: November 15, 2012Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Charles thomas Paclik
Date: 2012-01-17T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2012-11-14T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 06/01/2012 09:00 AM D- 19
Date: 2012-01-20T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 12/18/2013 09:00 AM D- 19
Date: June 27, 2013Case Management Statement of Charles Thomas Paclik Filed
Date: 2012-11-13T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed
Date: December 05, 2013Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2012-07-30T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 07/30/2012 09:00 AM D- 19
Date: 2012-05-30T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2012-07-30T00:00:00Complaint - Insurance Coverage Filed
Date: 2012-01-17T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2012-01-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Charles Thomas Paclik Filed
Date: 2012-07-16T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint
Date: September 10, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.