Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lvnv Funding Llc Assignee Of Sears Premier Card, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Shabaan, Mohameed, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions119 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3836 days |
Declaration non military status Filed
Date: March 29, 2018Notice of Change of Name and Address Filed
Date: 2011-05-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for LVNV Funding LLC Assignee of Sears Premier Card
Date: 2014-06-09T00:00:00Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for LVNV Funding LLC Assignee of Sears Premier
Date: 2011-05-05T00:00:00Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) As To Mohameed Shabaan Filed
Date: 2009-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Name and Address Filed
Date: 2010-12-22T00:00:00Default Judgment (Money) Entered
Date: 2009-04-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for LVNV Funding LLC Assignee of Sears Premier Card
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from los angeles Filed
Date: July 03, 2019Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Mohameed Shabaan Filed
Date: 2009-02-23T00:00:00Application and Renewal of Judgment Filed
Date: February 19, 2019Declaration of Non-Military Status Filed
Date: 2014-06-09T00:00:00Writ of Execution - Partially Satisfied from Los Angeles Filed
Date: August 26, 2014Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: March 04, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.