Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Aviles, Brandon, Brandon Aviles, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 31, 2008 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions190 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time452 days |
Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: October 26, 2009Limited Collections Order
Date: October 26, 2009Dismissal Court Ordered : Delay in Prosecution (CCP 583) Filed
Date: October 26, 2009Compliance Hearing 10/26/2009 09:01 AM D- 31
Date: July 31, 2009Proposed Judgment Request
Date: February 06, 2009Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Request
Date: February 06, 2009Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033 Request
Date: February 06, 2009Declaration Request Re: interest
Date: February 06, 2009Declaration Other: Request
Date: February 06, 2009Proof of Service on Complaint As to Brandon Aviles Filed
Date: October 16, 2008Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: July 31, 2008Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for LVNV Funding LLC
Date: July 31, 2008Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: July 31, 2008Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected
Date: March 20, 2009Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To Brandon Aviles Filed
Date: February 06, 2009Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: 2008-07-31T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2008-07-31T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Brandon Aviles Filed
Date: 2008-10-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for LVNV Funding LLC
Date: 2008-07-31T00:00:00Limited Collections Order
Date: October 26, 2009Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected
Date: March 20, 2009Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To Brandon Aviles Filed
Date: 2009-02-06T00:00:00Dismissal Court Ordered : Delay in Prosecution (CCP 583) Filed
Date: October 26, 2009Compliance Hearing 10/26/2009 09:01 AM D- 31
Date: July 31, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.