Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Linda Mckinney, filed a(n) Limited Civil case against Alameda County Sheriff'S Department, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2008 |
CategoryLimited Civil |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Dismissal Court Ordered : Delay in Prosecution (CCP 583) Filed
Date: March 01, 2010Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: March 01, 2010Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: March 01, 2010Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: January 05, 2009Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: January 05, 2009Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: January 05, 2009Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: October 30, 2008Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 01/05/2009 02:30 PM D- 607
Date: December 17, 2008Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: December 11, 2008Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: October 30, 2008Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: August 21, 2008Case Management Statement of Linda McKinney Filed
Date: August 21, 2008Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: August 21, 2008Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: July 15, 2008Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: August 06, 2008Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: August 06, 2008Notice of Judicial Assignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: February 29, 2008Initial Case Management Conference 07/15/2008 09:00 AM D- 520
Date: February 29, 2008Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Linda McKinney
Date: February 28, 2008Complaint - Other Filed
Date: February 28, 2008For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.