Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Vishnu "Raju" Patel, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case represented by Herbert Hayden, against A.A.G. Construction, Inc, A.A.G. Development, Inc, A.A.G. Roofing, Inc, Clifford Charbonneau, New Age Dimension Realty, Inc.,, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 26, 2007 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Returned Mail: Case Management Order Filed
Date: September 02, 2008Dismissal Court Ordered : Failure to comply with local rules Filed
Date: August 26, 2008Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: August 26, 2008Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: August 26, 2008Returned Mail: Case Management Order Filed
Date: August 01, 2008Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: July 29, 2008Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: July 29, 2008Returned Mail: Case Management Order Filed
Date: July 08, 2008Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: July 01, 2008Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: February 28, 2008Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: July 01, 2008Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: February 28, 2008Notice of Judicial Assignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: October 29, 2007Initial Case Management Conference 03/10/2008 09:00 AM D- 301
Date: October 29, 2007Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: October 26, 2007Complaint Fraud Filed
Date: October 26, 2007For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.