Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Frank Wong, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case represented by Phillip G. Vermont, against Tamer, Triple Trade, Inc., A California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2006 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: November 15, 2006Motion for Sanctions Granted in Part
Date: November 15, 2006Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: November 15, 2006Declaration in Support Phillip G Vermont
Date: October 06, 2006Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: October 06, 2006Motion for Sanctions Filed for Creditor
Date: October 06, 2006Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: August 24, 2006Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: August 24, 2006Motion to Compel Production of Documents Granted
Date: August 24, 2006Declaration in Support of Phillip G. Vermont
Date: July 24, 2006Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: July 24, 2006Motion to Compel Production of Documents Filed for Creditor
Date: July 24, 2006OEX - Bench Warrant ordered for $250
Date: June 21, 2006Proof of Service on Order of Examination Filed
Date: June 02, 2006Order of Examination 06/21/2006 09:00 AM D- 504
Date: May 04, 2006Rejection Letter Issued on Civil Order of Examination
Date: April 27, 2006Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for Frank Wong
Date: March 15, 2006Unlawful Detainer Court Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: March 15, 2006Judgment Entered
Date: March 15, 2006Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 03/15/2006 09:00 AM D- 504
Date: February 27, 2006Proof of Service (Amended) on Complaint As to Tamer (Tamer) Elmalawany Filed
Date: February 22, 2006Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: February 08, 2006Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: February 08, 2006For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.