Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Worldwide Asset Purchasing, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Martinez, Victor, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions118 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time132 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Worldwide Asset Purchasing, LLC
Date: December 30, 2005Case Management Statement of Worldwide Asset Purchasing, LLC Filed
Date: May 11, 2006Initial Collection Case Review 06/01/2006 09:00 AM D- 511
Date: April 06, 2006Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: December 30, 2005Proof of Service on Complaint As to Victor Martinez Filed
Date: February 06, 2006Default Judgment (Money) Entered
Date: April 27, 2006Summons w/o Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 27, 2006Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) As To Victor Martinez Filed
Date: April 27, 2006For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.