Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Palisades Collection, L.L.C., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Dumlao, Douglas, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2005 |
CategoryCollections |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time259 days |
Summons w/o Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 29, 2006Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: December 13, 2005Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 31, 2006Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: May 05, 2006Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Palisades Collection, L.L.C.
Date: December 13, 2005Initial Collection Case Review 05/18/2006 09:00 AM D- 520
Date: March 22, 2006For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.