Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kenton Gooden, filed a(n) Limited Civil case against Onteryl Mason, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 22, 2005 |
CategoryLimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
This complaint is a contract dispute between Kenton Gooden and Onteryl Mason. The complaint was filed in the Superior Court of California, County of Alameda. The jurisdiction of the case is not specified. The amount demanded in the case is $1,419.60....
Complaint Fraud Dismissed
Date: August 24, 2006Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: August 24, 2006Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: August 24, 2006Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 08/24/2006 09:00 AM D- 511
Date: July 17, 2006Order re Case Management Filed
Date: June 13, 2006Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: June 13, 2006Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: June 13, 2006Order re Case Management Filed
Date: April 11, 2006Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: April 11, 2006Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: April 11, 2006Initial Case Management Conference 04/11/2006 09:00 AM D- 511
Date: February 21, 2006Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Kenton Gooden
Date: November 22, 2005Complaint Fraud Filed
Date: November 22, 2005For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.