Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Antonio Vasquez, Jenny Vasquez, Salvador Vasquez, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case against Bank Of America, represented by Glenn H. Wechsler, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2004 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
This complaint is filed by the plaintiffs, Salvador Vasquez, Jenny Vasquez, and Antonio Vasquez, against Bank of America and Does 1-15. The plaintiffs allege breach of contract, fraud, unfair business practices, and conversion. They claim that Bank o...
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: November 18, 2005Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: May 25, 2005Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: June 07, 2005Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: May 25, 2005Case Management Statement of Bank of America Filed
Date: August 02, 2005Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: August 02, 2005Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: August 25, 2005Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 28, 2005Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: September 06, 2005Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: August 25, 2005Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: September 02, 2005Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: October 28, 2005Case Management Statement of Bank of America Filed
Date: November 04, 2005Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: February 14, 2006Reply Filed
Date: February 02, 2006Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: February 10, 2006Declaration in Support Of Glenn H. Wechsler
Date: January 10, 2006Case Management Statement of Bank of America Filed
Date: February 14, 2006Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: February 28, 2006Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: October 31, 2005Reply Filed
Date: October 20, 2005Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: October 28, 2005Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: December 22, 2005Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: January 10, 2006Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant
Date: January 10, 2006Amended Answer to Complaint Filed for Bank of America
Date: December 22, 2005Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: December 22, 2005Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: July 08, 2005Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 27, 2005Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: July 11, 2005Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: July 08, 2005Motion for Discovery Sanctions Filed for Defendant
Date: March 20, 2006Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: February 28, 2006Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: September 02, 2005Declaration in Support
Date: March 20, 2006Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: February 10, 2006Motion to Compel (Motion) Granted
Date: February 10, 2006Case Management Conf Continuance 02/28/2006 09:00 AM D- 520
Date: January 24, 2006Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: April 19, 2006Opposition Filed
Date: April 12, 2006Motion for Discovery Sanctions Granted
Date: April 19, 2006Notice of Settlement Filed for Salvador Vasquez, Jenny Vasquez, Antonio Vasquez
Date: June 16, 2006Opposition to Motion to Compel and Request for Monetary Sanctions Filed
Date: January 31, 2006Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: May 22, 2006Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: March 20, 2006Demurrer to Complaint Filed by Bank of America
Date: June 07, 2005Demurrer Sustained With Leave to Amend
Date: July 08, 2005Demurrer to Complaint Filed by Bank of America
Date: August 02, 2005Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Salvador Vasquez
Date: December 30, 2004Case Management Statement of Salvador Vasquez, Jenny Vasquez, Antonio Vasquez Filed
Date: August 25, 2005Complaint Fraud Filed
Date: December 30, 2004Demurrer Sustained With Leave to Amend
Date: September 02, 2005Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: December 01, 2005Demurrer Sustained With Leave to Amend
Date: October 28, 2005Demurrer to Complaint Filed by Bank of America
Date: November 18, 2005First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: July 25, 2005Opposition to Demurrer Filed
Date: June 28, 2005Initial Case Management Conference 04/27/2005 09:00 AM D- 520
Date: February 24, 2005Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: June 07, 2005Case Management Statement of Salvador Vasquez, Jenny Vasquez, Antonio Vasquez Filed
Date: April 20, 2005Notice of Motion
Date: August 02, 2005Opposition to Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint Filed
Date: December 12, 2005Notice of Motion
Date: November 18, 2005Reply Brief in Support of Motion Filed
Date: December 14, 2005Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: December 01, 2005Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Filed
Date: July 06, 2005Notice of Motion
Date: September 28, 2005Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer Filed
Date: August 23, 2005Demurrer to Complaint Filed by Bank of America
Date: September 28, 2005Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed
Date: August 02, 2006Opposition to Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint Filed
Date: October 18, 2005Motion Denied
Date: October 28, 2005First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: September 19, 2005Motion Filed by Bank of America
Date: September 27, 2005First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: November 10, 2005Demurrer to Complaint - Overruled
Date: December 22, 2005Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: April 27, 2005For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.