Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Phillip E Grimes, Sr, filed a(n) Limited Civil case against Salwan Property Management, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 28, 2004 |
CategoryLimited Civil |
Last RefreshedMay 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Returned Mail: Minute Order Filed
Date: May 06, 2005Returned Mail: Order To Show Cause re: Dismissal Filed
Date: June 15, 2005Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: June 06, 2005Complaint - Professional Negligence Dismissed
Date: June 06, 2005Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: June 06, 2005Order to Show Cause For Plaintiff Filed
Date: April 21, 2005Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: April 18, 2005Returned Mail: Minute Order Received
Date: March 23, 2005Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: March 07, 2005Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: March 07, 2005Initial Case Management Conference 03/07/2005 09:00 AM D- 512
Date: December 27, 2004Notice of Order Assigned to Dept 512 for All Purposes Filed
Date: December 28, 2004Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Phillip E Grimes Sr
Date: October 28, 2004Complaint - Professional Negligence Filed
Date: October 28, 2004For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.