Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Margaret A. Matthews, Michael Beggs, Patricia Beggs, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case against Helios Healthcare, Llc, Kathleen Nakashima, represented by Kathleen M. Abdallah, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2004 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Compliance Hearing 06/01/2005 02:00 PM D- 511
Date: January 18, 2005First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: November 15, 2004Notice of Settlement Filed for Patricia Beggs, Michael Beggs, Margaret A. Matthews
Date: January 07, 2005Order To Consolidate Pending Actions, For Leave Of Court To File First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: November 10, 2004Civil Ex-Parte 11/03/2004 09:00 AM D- 606
Date: November 01, 2004Stipulation Re: Consolidate Cases Filed for Patricia Beggs, Michael Beggs, Margaret A. Matthews
Date: November 01, 2004Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: May 28, 2004Initial Case Management Conference 05/28/2004 10:30 AM D- 606
Date: March 29, 2004Case Management Statement of Helios Healthcare, LLC Filed
Date: May 13, 2004Answer to Complaint Filed for Helios Healthcare, LLC
Date: March 19, 2004Proof of Service on Complaint As to Helios Healthcare, LLC Filed
Date: March 10, 2004Declaration of Plaintiff Patricia Beggs as Successor in Interest to Decedent Filed
Date: January 27, 2004Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Patricia Beggs
Date: January 27, 2004Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: May 31, 2005Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: January 27, 2004Case Management Statement of Helios Healthcare, LLC Filed
Date: 2004-05-13T00:00:00Declaration of Plaintiff Patricia Beggs as Successor in Interest to Decedent Filed
Date: 2004-01-27T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2004-11-15T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 05/28/2004 10:30 AM D- 606
Date: 2004-03-29T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Patricia Beggs, Michael Beggs, Margaret A. Matthews Filed
Date: 2004-03-12T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: May 31, 2005Order To Consolidate Pending Actions, For Leave Of Court To File First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2004-11-10T00:00:00Stipulation Re: Consolidate Cases Filed for Patricia Beggs, Michael Beggs, Margaret A. Matthews
Date: 2004-11-01T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Helios Healthcare, LLC
Date: 2004-03-19T00:00:00Compliance Hearing 06/01/2005 02:00 PM D- 511
Date: 2005-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed for Patricia Beggs, Michael Beggs, Margaret A. Matthews
Date: 2005-01-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Patricia Beggs, Michael Beggs, Margaret A. Matthews Filed
Date: 2004-05-13T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Helios Healthcare, LLC Filed
Date: 2004-03-10T00:00:00Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: 2004-01-27T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte 11/03/2004 09:00 AM D- 606
Date: 2004-11-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Patricia Beggs
Date: 2004-01-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2004-05-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.