Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Evans, Jalon, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Myers, Jamisha, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Clifford T. Blakely, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClifford T. Blakely, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryChild Custody |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2021 |
Judge: Request for Order re:... |
||
September 23, 2021 |
Request for Order re:...
Judge: Clifford T. Blakely |
||
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Continued | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Reschedule Hearing Filed | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to RFO - Family Law dept: 513 date: 10/27/2021 time: 01:30 PM | |
September 23, 2021 |
Judge: Request for Order re:... |
||
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Denying Temporary Emergency Orders Pending Hearing Filed | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Granting Request for Order & Other Orders; Denying OST & Temporary Emergency Orders Pending He | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law 09/23/2021 08:30 AM D- 513 | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Custody and Support of Minor Children Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.