Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Shandobil, Benjamin, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Shandobil, Carrie, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Clifford T. Blakely, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClifford T. Blakely, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2022 |
Judge: Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention |
||
April 11, 2022 |
Judge: Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention |
||
November 01, 2021 |
Judge: Request for Order re:... |
||
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law 11/01/2021 08:30 AM D- 513 | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Granting Notice of Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel Filed | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Denying Temporary Emergency Orders Pending Hearing Filed | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Granting Request For Order & Order Shortening Time; Denying Temporary Emergency Orders Pending | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Electronic Service Filed | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Electronic Service of FL-300 re Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Order re:... Order Shortening Time,.. Filed by Respondent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.