Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lagrone, Janie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lagrone, Wesley, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Clifford T. Blakely, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClifford T. Blakely, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2022 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2022 |
Judge: Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention |
||
November 09, 2021 |
Judge: Request for Order re:... |
||
October 19, 2021 |
Judge: Request for Order re:... |
||
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to RFO - Family Law 11/09/2021 08:30 AM D- 513 | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order Filed | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Domestic Violence Hearing 01/06/2022 08:30 AM D- 513 | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Family Law Status Conference 01/06/2022 08:30 AM D- 513 | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Electronic Service - Amended FOAH Filed | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Rejection Letter Issued on Other Ex Parte | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Continuance of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.