Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Horne, Alexandria Hutchinson, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Horne, Raymond Jonathan Jr., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Clifford T. Blakely, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClifford T. Blakely, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2022 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2022 |
Judge: Family Law Status Conference |
||
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Order Issued | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference 01/26/2022 08:30 AM D- 513 | |
August 25, 2021 |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Clifford T. Blakely |
||
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Family Law Status Conference dept: 513 date: 01/26/2022 time: 08:30 AM | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Commenced and Continued | |
August 25, 2021 |
Judge: Family Law Status Conference |
||
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing re Other/Additional Orders Filed | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference 08/25/2021 08:30 AM D- 513 | |
June 23, 2021 |
Request for Order re:...
Judge: Clifford T. Blakely |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.