Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Shah, Kinjal, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Shah, Saj, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Clifford T. Blakely, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClifford T. Blakely, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2021 |
Judge: Request for Order re: Modification... |
||
November 10, 2021 |
Judge: Family Centered Case Resolution Conference |
||
November 04, 2021 |
Judge: Motion to Strike |
||
October 21, 2021 |
Judge: Request for Order re: Modification... |
||
October 07, 2021 |
Request for Order re: Modification...
Judge: Clifford T. Blakely |
||
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to RFO - Family Law 12/02/2021 08:30 AM D- 513 | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Family Centered Case Resolution Conference 12/02/2021 08:30 AM D- 513 | |
October 07, 2021 |
Judge: Request for Order re: Modification... |
||
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Received |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.