Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Raj, Anjali, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Munshi, Swapan, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Alice Vilardi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlice Vilardi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 15, 2018 |
CategoryDv-100 Request For Order, Domestic Violence Prevention |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time388 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record Filed | |
March 21, 2019 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Hearing Dropped from dept: 513 date: 03/20/2019 time: 09:05 AM | |
March 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Granted | |
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Filed for Swapan Munshi | |
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to RFO - Family Law 03/20/2019 09:05 AM D- 513 | |
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Granted | |
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Filed for Swapan Munshi | |
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Reassignment to 513 Filed | |
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to RFO - Family Law 01/16/2019 09:05 AM D- 513 | |
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration Filed for Respondent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.