Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Crawford, Kentaya, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Howard, Noah, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Alice Vilardi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlice Vilardi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 27, 2017 |
CategoryDv-100 Request For Order, Domestic Violence Prevention |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time284 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing re Child Custody,.. Filed | |
June 21, 2018 |
Request for Order Family Law Hearing
Judge: Alice Vilardi |
||
June 21, 2018 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
June 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counselor's Report Received | |
June 21, 2018 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law 06/21/2018 09:05 AM D- 516 | |
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Order on Submitted Issue Filed | |
April 09, 2018 |
Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention
Judge: Paul Slavit |
||
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Reissuance of Temporary Restraining Order (Domestic Violence) Denied | |
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Ruling Taken Under Submission |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.