Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bershell, Ronnie, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Brown, Ashley, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Alice Vilardi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlice Vilardi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 17, 2017 |
CategoryDv-100 Request For Order, Domestic Violence Prevention |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time149 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing re Child Custody,.. Filed | |
June 30, 2017 |
Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention
Judge: Alice Vilardi |
||
June 30, 2017 |
Request for Order re: Modification...
Judge: Alice Vilardi |
||
June 30, 2017 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
June 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention Dismissed | |
June 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counselor's Report Filed | |
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration re: Child Custody Filed | |
June 19, 2017 |
Request for Order re: Modification...
Judge: Alice Vilardi |
||
June 19, 2017 |
Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention
Judge: Alice Vilardi |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.