Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Atkins-Hill VS Hill
On April 17, 2017 a civil case was filed by Atkins-Hill, Thelma M., against Hill, D'Mond T., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Jason Anthony Clay presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 17, 2017
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Category
Dissolution of Marriage
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Judgment of Divorce,Annulment,Separation
Case Duration
1 year, 2 months and 30 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2018 |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Jason Clay |
||
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Commenced and Completed | |
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment of Dissolution Filed | |
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed | |
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Judgment Received | |
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration Re: Default or Uncontested Judgment Filed for Thelma M. Atkins-Hill | |
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Rejection Letter Issued on Proposed Judgment | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party D'Mond T. Hill Filed | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to D'Mond T. Hill Entered | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration Re: Default or Uncontested Judgment Filed for Thelma M. Atkins-Hill | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure Filed | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Judgment Received | |
January 02, 2018 |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Jason Clay |
||
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Order Issued | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference 07/17/2018 02:30 PM D- 510 | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Commenced and Completed | |
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Family Law Status Conference 01/02/2018 01:30 PM D- 510 | |
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Reassignment of Judge to Dept. 510- Jason Clay Filed | |
August 24, 2017 |
Temporary Restraining Order (Domestic Violence Prevention)
Judge: Gregory Syren |
||
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (Domestic Violence Prevention) Dismissed | |
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference 12/18/2017 01:30 PM D- 504 | |
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service (CLETS) on Petition for Dissolution of Marriage As to D'Mond T. Hill Filed | |
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure Filed | |
July 18, 2017 |
Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention
Judge: Delia Trevino |
||
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing 08/24/2017 09:00 AM D- 504 | |
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Reissuance of Temporary Restraining Order (DV) Granted and Notice of Hearing Issued | |
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing 07/18/2017 09:00 AM D- 504 | |
July 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration of Diligence Filed | |
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Separate Property Declaration Filed | |
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration Filed for Petitioner | |
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Community and Quasi-Community Property Declaration Filed | |
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure Filed | |
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention Filed for Petitioner | |
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (DV) Granted and Notice of Hearing Issued | |
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (Domestic Violence Prevention) Received for Thelma M. Atkins-Hill | |
May 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service on Petition for Dissolution of Marriage As to D'Mond T. Hill Filed | |
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons on Petition Issued and Filed | |
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Thelma M. Atkins-Hill | |
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Petition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed | |
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees As to Thelma M. Atkins-Hill Granted |