Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Simon, Lathan, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Manosca, Anita, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Michael Bishay presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2016 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time1091 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration Re: Default or Uncontested Judgment Filed for Lathan Simon | |
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Granting Proposed order (Waive filing/service, vacate hearing) Filed | |
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing Vacated: Family Law Status Conference 10/17/2018 02:00 PM D- 516 | |
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Received | |
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration Of Shumsha Hanif-Cruz In Support Of Petitioner's Request Filed | |
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Commenced and Continued | |
September 19, 2018 |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Michael Bishay |
||
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Family Law Status Conference dept: 516 date: 10/17/2018 time: 02:00 PM | |
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation to Commissioner Filed | |
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Notice of Reassignment of Judge to Dept. 516 Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.