Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bazan, Francisca, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bazan, Miguel, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Somnath Raj Chatterjee presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2016 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions897 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time1058 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2018 |
Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention
Judge: Somnath Raj Chatterjee |
||
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention Dismissed | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service on Petition for Dissolution of Marriage As to Francisca Bazan Filed | |
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous DV-116 Granted. Filed | |
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Domestic Violence Hearing 11/28/2018 09:00 AM D- 513 | |
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Continue Hearing and Reissue Temporary Restraining Order (Domestic Violence) Granted | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Continue Hearing and Reissue Temporary Restraining Order (Domestic Violence) Filed by Petitioner | |
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Diligence Filed | |
October 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (Domestic Violence Prevention) Received for Francisca Bazan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.