Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Alameda, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Bradley, Brandon Lammar, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Sue Alexander presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryParental Relationship/Obligations |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions446 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
|
Case Cycle Time446 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Dismissal Court Ordered Without Prejudice Filed | |
November 10, 2016 |
Notice of Motion re
Judge: Sue Alexander |
||
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
September 21, 2016 |
Notice of Motion re
Judge: Sue Alexander |
||
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Continued | |
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to RFO - Family Law dept: 509 date: 11/10/2016 time: 09:05 AM | |
July 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion re Child Support,.. Filed by Petitioner | |
July 21, 2016 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law 09/21/2016 09:00 AM D- 509 | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Answer to Governmental Complaint Filed for Brandon Lammar Bradley | |
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service on Summons and Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations As to Brandon Lamm |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.