Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mills, Victoria, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Alvarado, Charlie, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Nikki Clark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedMay 15, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2021 |
Judge: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage |
||
April 02, 2021 |
Judge: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage |
||
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to OSC - Family Law 05/14/2021 08:45 AM D- 503 | |
February 12, 2021 |
Judge: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage |
||
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to OSC - Family Law 04/02/2021 08:45 AM D- 503 | |
June 27, 2019 |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Nikki Clark |
||
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Sanctions Ordered | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law 02/12/2021 08:45 AM D- 503 | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Commenced and Completed | |
April 04, 2019 |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Nikki Clark |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.