Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ramos, Mae Langaman, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ramos, Kristoffer James Ayala, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Alison M. Tucher presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions343 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time377 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Hearing Dropped from dept: 507 date: 04/27/2016 time: 09:00 AM | |
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed | |
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment of Dissolution Filed | |
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Proposed Judgment Received | |
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Kristoffer James Ayala Ramos Filed | |
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration Re: Default or Uncontested Judgment Filed for Mae Langaman Ramos | |
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Kristoffer James Ayala Ramos Entered | |
October 23, 2015 |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Alison Tucher |
||
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Commenced and Completed | |
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference 04/27/2016 09:00 AM D- 507 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.