Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Scott, Christopher, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Headley-Scott, Tiffany Angela, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Somnath Raj Chatterjee presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 13, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions821 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time1707 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing re Child Custody,.. Filed | |
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing re Child Custody,.. Filed | |
March 05, 2019 |
Request for Order re: Modification...
Judge: Richard Seabolt |
||
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Reassignment to Department 521 Filed | |
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to RFO - Family Law 03/05/2019 09:05 AM D- 521 | |
December 20, 2018 |
Request for Order re: Modification...
Judge: Somnath Raj Chatterjee |
||
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counselor's Report Filed | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to RFO - Family Law dept: 513 date: 03/05/2019 time: 09:05 AM | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Continued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.