Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Nguyen VS Shah
On August 12, 2014 a civil case was filed by Nguyen, Phong Thanh, against Shah, Shefali A., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Thomas J. Nixon presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 12, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Category
Dissolution of Marriage
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
3 years and 17 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2017 |
Order to Show Cause re
Judge: Thomas J. Nixon |
||
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Petition for Dissolution of Marriage Dismissed | |
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to OSC - Family Law 08/28/2017 03:30 PM D- 503 | |
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law 08/28/2017 09:00 AM D- 503 | |
February 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Order Issued | |
December 17, 2015 |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Noël Wise |
||
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference 04/04/2016 09:05 AM D- 302 | |
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Commenced and Completed | |
July 02, 2015 |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Noël Wise |
||
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference 12/17/2015 09:05 AM D- 302 | |
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Commenced and Completed | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference 07/02/2015 09:05 AM D- 302 | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Order Issued | |
February 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Family Law Status Conference 03/05/2015 09:05 AM D- 302 | |
December 12, 2014 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Brad Seligman |
||
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Initial Family Law Status Conference Commenced and Completed | |
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Order Issued | |
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference 03/06/2015 09:13 AM D- 302 | |
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees As to Phong Thanh Nguyen Granted | |
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed | |
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Initial Family Law Status Conference 12/12/2014 09:02 AM D- 504 | |
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act Filed | |
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Initial Family Law Status Conference 12/11/2014 09:01 AM D- 302 | |
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons on Petition Issued and Filed | |
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Phong Thanh Nguyen |