Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kessler, Katie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Kessler, Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Sue Alexander presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 08, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions399 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time409 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Hearing Dropped from dept: 504 date: 10/21/2015 time: 09:00 AM | |
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed | |
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment of Dissolution Filed | |
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference 10/21/2015 09:00 AM D- 504 | |
August 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration Re: Default or Uncontested Judgment Filed for Katie Kessler | |
August 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Proposed Judgment Received | |
July 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Matthew Kessler Entered | |
July 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Matthew Kessler Filed | |
July 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Community and Quasi-Community Property Declaration Filed | |
July 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration Filed for Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.