Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Alameda, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Tuitavuki, James Paul, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Boydine A. Hall presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 05, 2014 |
CategoryParental Relationship/Obligations |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions42 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
|
Case Cycle Time339 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Summons and Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations As to James Paul Tuitavuki | |
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration re: Request for Order re:... Filed | |
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Rejection Letter Issued on Notice of Motion to Set Aside Judgment of Paternity | |
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing re Child Custody,.. Filed | |
June 01, 2015 |
Request for Order re:...
Judge: Boydine Hall |
||
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service on Summons and Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations As to Evelin Ferna | |
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Referred to Family Court Services | |
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Order re:... Child Custody,.. Filed by Third Party | |
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.